VA HB2096 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Procurement; exemption for Virginia Industries for the Blind. Exempts from the requirements of the Public Procurement Act (? 2.2-4300 et seq.) the Virginia Industries for the Blind when procuring components, materials, supplies, or services for use in commodities and services furnished to the federal government in connection with its operation as an AbilityOne Program-qualified nonprofit agency for the blind.
Title
Virginia Industries for the Blind; exempted from certain procurements.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625) | |
2017-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 625 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2096ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101371D |