VA HB2095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registration of peer recovery specialists and qualified mental health professionals. Authorizes the registration of peer recovery specialists and qualified mental health professionals by the Board of Counseling. The bill defines "qualified mental health professional" as a person who by education and experience is professionally qualified and registered by the Board of Counseling to provide collaborative mental health services for adults or children. The bill requires that a qualified mental health professional provide such services as an employee or independent contractor of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services or a provider licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill defines "registered peer recovery specialist" as a person who by education and experience is professionally qualified and registered by the Board of Counseling to provide collaborative services to assist individuals in achieving sustained recovery from the effects of addiction or mental illness, or both. The bill requires that a registered peer recovery specialist provide such services as an employee or independent contractor of the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, a provider licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, a practitioner licensed by or holding a permit issued from the Department of Health Professions, or a facility licensed by the Department of Health. The bill adds qualified mental health professionals and registered peer recovery specialists to the list of mental health providers that are required to take actions to protect third parties under certain circumstances and notify clients of their right to report to the Department of Health Professions any unethical, fraudulent, or unprofessional conduct. The bill directs the Board of Counseling and the Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 280 days of its enactment. This bill is identical to SB 1020.
Title
Peer recovery specialists and qualified mental health professionals; registration.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 12-N) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 12-N) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2095ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101364D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2095E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101364D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Professions and Occupations
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Professions and Occupations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |