VA HB2094 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments; reduction. Reduces the total number and type of required Standards of Learning assessments to the minimum requirements established by the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, as amended.
Title
Public schools; Standards of Learning assessments.
Sponsors
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] |
Del. William Wampler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101063D |