VA HB2094 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings. Allows localities to regulate the possession of firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof in, or the carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof into, any building owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes. Current law prohibits localities from adopting or enforcing any ordinance, resolution, or motion regarding firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof unless expressly authorized by statute.
Title
Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100848D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2094 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2094+hil |