VA HB2091 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Smoking in motor vehicle with a minor present. Expands the age group of minors in the presence of whom it is illegal to smoke in a motor vehicle from those under the age of eight to those under the age of 16. The bill expands the definition of "smoke" to include use of a nicotine vapor product.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking; unlawful in motor vehicle with a minor present.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100789D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462810.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback