VA HB2091 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia; supervision of magistrates. Requires the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court to establish and require magistrates be available for performing certain duties related to issuing temporary detention orders. Under current law, the chief judge of each district court is responsible for this oversight. The change makes this responsibility consistent with the current supervisory structure set out in § 19.2-35, which grants supervisory authority over the magistrates to the Executive Secretary. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Magistrates; supervision by Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087) | |
2013-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2091ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101002D |
Same As/Similar To
SB753 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Criminal Procedure
Supreme Court of Virginia
Criminal Procedure
Supreme Court of Virginia