VA HB2090 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Quality; funding to support achievement of at-risk students. Requires, in addition to the positions supported by basic aid, state funding to be provided to support the achievement of at-risk students, based upon the concentration of students identified as eligible for federal free or reduced lunch, as provided in the general appropriation act, in each school division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Quality; funding to support achievement of at-risk students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Education
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24HouseAssigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104149D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback