VA HB2090 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable solicitations; registration statement. Requires a charitable organization to include in its annual registration statement a statement indicating the percentage of contributions received that was dedicated to the charitable purpose of the charitable organization during the preceding fiscal year.
Title
Charitable solicitations; registration statement to include percentage of contributions.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2090ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102745D |
Subjects
Charitable Civic and Volunteer Institutions and Organizations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries