VA HB2089 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; coverage for prescription contraceptives. Requires health insurance carriers to provide coverage, under any health insurance contract, policy, or plan that includes coverage for prescription drugs on an outpatient basis, for any prescribed contraceptive drug or contraceptive device. The bill prohibits a health insurance carrier from imposing upon any person receiving contraceptive benefits pursuant to the provisions of the bill any copayment, coinsurance payment, or fee. The provisions of the bill apply to health insurance contracts, policies, or plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; coverage for prescription contraceptives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Commerce and Energy
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N)
2023-01-25HouseAssigned sub: Subcommittee #4
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102391D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.5:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback