VA HB2089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; school buildings; potable water; lead testing. Requires each local school board to develop and implement a plan to test potable water from sources identified by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as high priority as often as is required of the supplying public water system by the Virginia Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water, giving priority in such testing plan to schools whose school building was constructed, in whole or in part, before 1986. The bill requires such plan and the results of each such test to be posted on the local school board's website and transmitted to and archived by the Virginia Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water. The bill stipulates that if the result of any such test indicates a level of lead in the potable water that is at or above 20 parts per billion, the school board shall develop, implement, and post on its website a plan to remediate the level of lead in the potable water to below 20 parts per billion and confirm such remediation by retesting the water at two consecutive six-month intervals.
Title
School boards, local; lead testing of potable water in schools.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100516D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2089 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2089+hil |