VA HB2088 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Postsecondary schools; student records and closures. Provides that in the event of a postsecondary school closure, the school shall transfer the academic and financial records of its students to the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia or enter an agreement with another school to preserve such records. The bill also requires that a closing school develop and submit to the Council a "teachout plan," which is a written agreement between or among postsecondary schools that provides for the equitable treatment of students if one of those institutions stops offering an educational program before all students enrolled in that program complete the program. The bill finally requires the Council to deny owners certification to operate another postsecondary school in the Commonwealth if the owner does not provide an adequate teachout plan or adequate preservation of records.
Title
Postsecondary schools; student records and closures.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Robert Tata [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2088ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2088H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104270D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104270D-H1 |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101292D |