VA HB2087 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prostitution-related crimes; minors; penalties. Increases from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 6 felony the penalties for the following crimes if a minor is involved: (i) keeping, residing in, or visiting a bawdy place; (ii) aiding prostitution; and (iii) using vehicles to promote prostitution. The bill also adds felony violations of these offenses to (a) the list of offenses for which registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry is required, (b) the definition of violent felony for the purposes of the sentencing guidelines, (c) the list of predicate criminal acts that constitutes the definition of street gangs, (d) the list of offenses that may constitute racketeering under the Virginia Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization Act, and (e) the offenses that may be investigated by a multi-jurisdiction grand jury. The bill also makes applicable to all persons, regardless of the gender of the victim, the crimes of (1) assisting or aiding in the abduction of or threatening to abduct a female under 16 years of age for the purpose of concubinage or prostitution, which the bill also changes to include any person under 18 years of age, and (2) placing or leaving one's wife in a bawdy place. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution-related crimes; minors, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Stanley, Deeds
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Watts, Bell, Robert B., Ransone
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2087H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106279D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106279D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103879D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171805(n/a)See Bill Text
182347(n/a)See Bill Text
182348(n/a)See Bill Text
182349(n/a)See Bill Text
182368(n/a)See Bill Text
18246.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18249(n/a)See Bill Text
182513(n/a)See Bill Text
192215.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2087
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2087+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2087H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0122+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0101+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2369+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0250+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0369+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2087+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0912HB2087+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3212+HB2087
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB2087+HB2087

Bill Comments

feedback