VA HB2084 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Health; certain communication prohibited. Prohibits any person employed by or who has entered into a contract to provide services on behalf of the Department of Health or a local department of health from initiating communication regarding health-related matters with a minor on behalf of the Department or local department of health without the consent of the minor's parent, except as otherwise required by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, Department of; certain communication prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101978D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3214.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback