VA HB2083 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wake surfing; proximity to certain structures or other persons. Prohibits a person within 200 feet of a dock, pier, boathouse, boat ramp, or other person in the water from operating a vessel on any inland lake that is more than 500 feet above sea level and of 20,000 acres or more in size, and wholly located within the Commonwealth (Smith Mountain Lake), while accompanied by a person or persons engaged in wake surfing.
Title
Wake surfing; proximity to certain structures or other persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | House | Engrossment refused by House |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending question ordered |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment by Delegate Byron agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102595D |