VA HB2083 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Restitution; modification of terms and conditions of payment plan. Permits the court to modify the terms and conditions of a restitution payment plan or amend the total amount of restitution due for good cause shown and only after a hearing of which the defendant, attorney for the Commonwealth, and victim have been notified. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restitution; modification of terms and conditions of payment plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103207D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.15(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback