VA HB2083 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prescription requirements; treatment of sexually transmitted disease. Allows a Department of Health practitioner to prescribe antibiotic therapy to the sexual partner of a patient diagnosed with a sexually transmitted disease without the physical examination normally required. This bill also requires the Commissioner of Health to convene a workgroup consisting of Department of Health staff and private practitioners to evaluate services provided by the Department of Health pursuant to this act, and to make appropriate recommendations for the use of expedited partner therapy in Virginia. The Commissioner shall report to the Secretary of Health and Human Resources concerning his findings and recommendations by July 1, 2012. The bill also has a sunset date of July 1, 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription requirements; treatment of sexually transmitted disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2011-01-21 House: Assigned HWI sub: #1
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103762D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413303(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback