VA HB2081 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; central electronic procurement website. Directs the Department of General Services, in an effort to facilitate prompt payment by contractors to subcontractors, to post on its central electronic procurement website certain information pertaining to payments made by public bodies to contractors.
Title
General Services, Department of; central electronic procurement website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102685D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Contractors and Subcontractors
General Services Department of
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation
Computer Services and Uses
Contractors and Subcontractors
General Services Department of
Professions and Occupations
Uncodified Legislation
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2081 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2081+hil |