VA HB2081 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Death certificates; multiple copies. Provides that the Board of Health shall require that, whenever certified copies of a death certificate are requested, up to 10 certified copies of such death certificate shall be provided to the requester at a cost not to exceed the fee for one certified copy of any other vital record.
Title
Death certificates; up to 10 certified copies shall be provided not to exceed fee for one copy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-28 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources | |
2011-01-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100101D |