VA HB2080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Physical evidence recovery kit tracking system. Provides that the Department of Forensic Science (Department) shall maintain a statewide electronic tracking system for physical evidence recovery kits where such kits will be assigned a unique identification number to track each kit from its distribution as an uncollected kit to the health care provider through to its destruction. The bill provides that the Department shall provide access to the tracking system to health care providers, law-enforcement agencies, the Division of Consolidated Laboratory Services, and the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner. The bill also provides that a health care provider shall inform the victim of sexual assault of the unique identification number assigned to the physical evidence recovery kit utilized by the health care provider during the forensic medical examination and provide the victim with information regarding the physical evidence recovery kit tracking system. The bill provides that records entered into the physical evidence recovery kit tracking system are confidential and are not subject to disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical evidence recovery kit tracking system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 7/1/20)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2080ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2080H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106263D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106263D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102186D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19211.13(n/a)See Bill Text
223706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2080
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2080+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2080H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2080ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0473+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0128+HB2080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0100+HB2080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2368+HB2080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0298+HB2080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2080+HB2080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2080+HB2080

Bill Comments

feedback