VA HB2078 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Forfeiture on recognizance; bail bondsman; suspension of license. Provides that if a forfeited recognizance is not paid within 150 days, the license of any bail bondsman on the bond shall be suspended by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) until the forfeiture is satisfied. The bill further provides that the court will then give notice to any employer of the bail bondsman on the bond to pay the forfeited recognizance within 10 business days. If such forfeited recognizance is not paid at the end of 10 business days, the bill provides that the Department shall suspend the licenses of such employer of the bail bondsman and agents thereof until the forfeited recognizance is satisfied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture on recognizance; bail bondsman, suspension of license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 200 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2078ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2078H1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105179D-H1
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105179D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101500D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192143(n/a)See Bill Text
91185.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2078
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2078+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2078H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2078ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0200+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0043+HB2078
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0015+HB2078
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1862+HB2078
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0228+HB2078
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2078+HB2078
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2078+HB2078

Bill Comments

feedback