VA HB2078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license. Authorizes the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board to grant an annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license to persons operating food concessions at any performing arts facility located in the arts and cultural district of the City of Harrisonburg, provided that the performing arts facility (i) is occupied under a bona fide long-term lease or concession agreement, the original term of which was more than five years; (ii) has been rehabilitated in accordance with historic preservation standards; (iii) has monthly gross receipts from the sale of food cooked, or prepared, and consumed on the premises and nonalcoholic beverages served on the premises that meet or exceed the monthly minimum established by Board regulations for mixed beverage restaurants; and (iv) has a total capacity in excess of 900 patrons. Such license shall authorize the sale, on the dates of performances or private or special events, of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption in areas upon the licensed premises approved by the Board.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2078ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103724D-E |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2078E |
2017-01-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Wilt agreed to |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103724D |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Arts and Humanities
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Harrisonburg City of
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic
Arts and Humanities
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Harrisonburg City of
Mixed Beverages Alcoholic