VA HB2077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Annual local audit. Requires localities to submit their annual local audit to the Auditor of Public Accounts. If the audit is not completed as required, the locality shall promptly post a statement on its website declaring that the required audit is pending, the reasons for the delay, and the estimated date of completion. Such statement shall also be posted and made available to the public at the next scheduled meeting of the local governing body. The statement shall continue to be posted and updated until the audit is completed.
Title
Local audit; localities required to submit their annual local audit to Auditor of Public Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103434D |