VA HB2077 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Services and Disaster Law of 2000; firearms; emergency shelter. Removes the authority of a governmental entity under the Emergency Services and Disaster Law of 2000 to limit lawful possession, carrying, transportation, sale, or transfer of firearms in any place or facility used by the governmental entity as an emergency shelter.
Title
Emergency Services and Disaster Law of 2000; reference to firearms, emergency shelter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-03 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2077ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 34-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102969D |