VA HB2076 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Water Control Board; stormwater management programs; regulations; professional license. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations requiring that all final plan elements, specifications, or calculations whose preparation requires a license in engineering, architecture, soil science, or a related profession be signed and sealed by a licensed professional. The bill requires the regulations to be effective no later than July 1, 2018, and exempts them from certain provisions of the Administrative Process Act. This bill is identical to SB 1127.
Title
State Water Control Board; stormwater management programs, regulations, professional license.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 16, 2017 | |
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/9/17 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2076ER) |
2017-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101647D-E |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2076E |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101647D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Stormwater Management
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Stormwater Management
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors