VA HB2074 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; beer to which spirits has been added. Allows mixed beverage licensees to pre-mix, store, and sell beer to which spirits has been added.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; beer to which spirits has been added.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in General Laws
2015-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100178D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41324(n/a)See Bill Text
41325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback