VA HB2074 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Check cashers; customer identification; civil penalty. Requires a person conducting business as a check casher to make a copy of each item cashed and either the customer's valid identification document or thumbprint. Records for each transaction are required to be retained for a period of one year and to be made available to law-enforcement officials. A violation of these requirements is punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $200.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Check cashers; copy of customer identification, civil penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Commerce and Labor
2011-01-20 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2011-01-17 House: Assigned C & L sub: #2
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103643D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
622107.1(n/a)See Bill Text
622108(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback