VA HB2073 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2073
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement; emergency. Provides that in a civil action for the wrongful death of an injured person such action may be brought by a personal representative of a decedent within two years after the death of the person or, if applicable, within two years of the conclusion of a criminal investigation by law enforcement of such death, whichever is longer. Under current law, a wrongful death action must be brought within two years of the death of the decedent. The bill contains an emergency clause. Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement; emergency. Provides that in a civil action for the wrongful death of an injured person such action may be brought by a personal representative of a decedent within two years after the death of the person or, if applicable, within two years of the conclusion of a criminal investigation by law enforcement of such death, whichever is longer. Under current law, a wrongful death action must be brought within two years of the death of the decedent. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2073H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Emergency clause added |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103581D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103581D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101459D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2073 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)