VA HB2073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement. Provides that, in a civil action for the wrongful death of an injured person, such an action may be brought by a personal representative of a decedent within two years after the death of the person or, if applicable, within two years of the conclusion of a criminal investigation by law enforcement of such death, whichever is longer. Under current law, a wrongful death action must be brought within two years of the death of the decedent. The bill contains an emergency clause. Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement. Provides that, in a civil action for the wrongful death of an injured person, such an action may be brought by a personal representative of a decedent within two years after the death of the person or, if applicable, within two years of the conclusion of a criminal investigation by law enforcement of such death, whichever is longer. Under current law, a wrongful death action must be brought within two years of the death of the decedent. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wrongful death statute of limitations; criminal investigations by law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2073H1
2021-01-29HouseEmergency clause added
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103581D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103581D-H1
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101459D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801244(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback