VA HB2073 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liability of real estate brokers and salespersons; false advertising and false information. Clarifies that a licensed real estate broker or salesperson shall not be liable for providing false information under certain circumstances, which includes any civil action or regulatory action brought under the real estate licensing laws.
Title
Real estate brokers and salespersons; liability of false advertising and false information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2073ER) |
2013-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 8-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103403D |