VA HB2072 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; competitive negotiation for professional services. Provides that for competitive negotiation for professional services, a public body may conduct negotiations simultaneously with the top two ranked offerors if the public body does not request or discuss nonbinding estimates of total project costs at the discussion stage and as long as such process is set forth in the Request for Proposal.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; competitive negotiation for professional services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102585D |