VA HB2072 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Overweight permits; forest products. Establishes an overweight permit for hauling forest products and provides for the weight limits and the fee of $130 for the permit.
Title
Forest products; establishes overweight permit for hauling.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Edward Scott [R] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Barry Knight [R] |
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0072) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 72 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2072ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101988D-E |
2015-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2072E |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101988D |
Same As/Similar To
SB989 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)