VA HB2071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2071
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation projects; resiliency. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to determine whether a project has been designed to be resilient when evaluating projects for the Six-Year Improvement Program and consider resiliency when establishing the Statewide Transportation Plan. The bill also requires the Commissioner of Highways to ensure resiliency is incorporated into the design standards for new construction projects. Transportation projects; resiliency. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to determine whether a project has been designed to be resilient when evaluating projects for the Six-Year Improvement Program and consider resiliency when establishing the Statewide Transportation Plan. The bill also requires the Commissioner of Highways to ensure resiliency is incorporated into the design standards for new construction projects.
Title
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process, resiliency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2071H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103472D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103472D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100799D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2071 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 371 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |