VA HB2071 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; job order contracting; limitations. Changes the maximum allowable sum of all jobs performed in a one-year contract term for job order contracts by increasing such maximum from the current amount of $5 million to $6 million on July 1, 2019. The bill also provides an exception to allow job order contracting in the case of safety improvements or traffic calming measures for individual job orders up to $250,000, subject to the maximum annual threshold amount as established in the bill. This bill is identical to SB 1153.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; job order contracting, limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 286 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2071ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102584D-E |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2071E |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102584D |