VA HB207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; no excuse; permanent absentee voter list. Permits any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in any election in which he is qualified to vote. The bill removes the current list of statutory reasons under which a person may be entitled to vote by absentee ballot and removes references to those reasons from other sections of the Code. The bill also provides for a special application by which any registered voter may apply to receive absentee ballots for all elections in which he is eligible to vote. A voter on the permanent absentee voter list remains on the list until the voter requests in writing to be removed from the list, the voter's registration is canceled or placed on inactive status pursuant to law, or the voter moves to a different address not in the same county or city of his registration. The provisions of the bill providing for a permanent absentee voter list do not become effective until July 1, 2021.
Title
Absentee voting; no excuse required, permanent absentee voter list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1201) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1201 (effective - see bill) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB207ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (52-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 43-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB207ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (55-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102060D-E |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB207E |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102060D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 705.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |