VA HB207 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conduct of police lineups. Establishes a uniform procedure to be used in all lineups by all law-enforcement agencies intended to ensure maximum accuracy of the procedure. The bill requires that the person who administers the lineup be a person who is not involved in the investigation of the criminal incident at issue and who does not know the identity of the suspect, that only one photograph or person is displayed to the eyewitness at a time, that all information about the suspect is kept from the eyewitness, that the lineup be recorded by videotape, audiotape or in writing by the administrator, and that the quality of the procedures used is subject to review in court by the finder of fact.
Title
Police lineups; establishes a uniform procedure to be used by all law-enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-03 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100263D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB207 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB207+hil |