VA HB2069 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; student member required. Requires each school board to establish a method for the selection of a student to serve as a member of the school board, subject to the following conditions: (i) the student is enrolled in a public high school in the local school division; (ii) any such student is eligible to be selected as a member of the school board without regard to such student's age or citizenship status, provided, however, that in the event that the method for selection of the student member is election, the student meets the qualifications to hold elective office set forth in Article II, Section 5 of the Constitution of Virginia; (iii) the school board establishes detailed policies, procedures, and timelines relating to such selection method, including policies that establish term length, eligibility to serve with or without voting privileges, eligibility for a salary, eligibility for selection to subsequent terms, and grounds for removal; and (iv) each student selected to serve as a member of the school board serves in addition to and not as a replacement for any member duly authorized and selected to serve on the school board in accordance with relevant law, and each such student member factors into the calculation of a quorum.
Title
School boards; student member required.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103337D |