VA HB2069 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2069
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; military decorations. Establishes a system for determining the cost of special license plates for recipients of a military decoration based on the order of precedence of such military decoration as determined by the federal Department of Defense or other relevant federal agency. The bill authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue plates with a "V" for Valor Device on appropriate plates issued by the Department reflecting a military decoration. The bill provides that special license plates for recipients of a military decoration are exempt from the prepaid application requirement for special license plates and may be issued to unremarried surviving spouses of eligible recipients. The bill creates special license plates for recipients of the Distinguished Flying Cross with a "V" for Valor, the Airman's Medal, the Army Soldier's Medal, the Coast Guard Medal, the Distinguished Service Medal, the Navy Distinguished Service Medal, the Marine Corps Distinguished Service Medal, the Air Force Distinguished Service Medal, the Defense Distinguished Service Medal, and the Defense Superior Service Medal. The bill changes from one-time to annual the $10 fee for certain special license plates issued after the effective date of this bill. Special license plates; military decorations. Establishes a system for determining the cost of special license plates for recipients of a military decoration based on the order of precedence of such military decoration as determined by the federal Department of Defense or other relevant federal agency. The bill authorizes the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue plates with a "V" for Valor Device on appropriate plates issued by the Department reflecting a military decoration. The bill provides that special license plates for recipients of a military decoration are exempt from the prepaid application requirement for special license plates and may be issued to unremarried surviving spouses of eligible recipients. The bill creates special license plates for recipients of the Distinguished Flying Cross with a "V" for Valor, the Airman's Medal, the Army Soldier's Medal, the Coast Guard Medal, the Distinguished Service Medal, the Navy Distinguished Service Medal, the Marine Corps Distinguished Service Medal, the Air Force Distinguished Service Medal, the Defense Distinguished Service Medal, and the Defense Superior Service Medal. The bill changes from one-time to annual the $10 fee for certain special license plates issued after the effective date of this bill.
Title
License plates, special; cost of plates for recipients of military decorations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2069H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103947D-H2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee on Transportation substitute rejected 21103327D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103947D-H2 |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-21 | House | Incorporates HB1797 (Walker) |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103327D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100264D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2069 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 725.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 742.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 745.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 745.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 745.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 745.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |