VA HB2068 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2068

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program. Establishes the Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program and authorizes the Governor to award grants to political subdivisions from the Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund as part of the Program. Such grants, in amounts up to $25,000, shall be awarded on a competitive basis to support infrastructure development projects that support local food production and sustainable farming. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to develop guidelines for the Program that favor projects that establish or maintain farmers markets; businesses or organizations that manage the aggregation, distribution, and marketing of food products primarily from local and regional producers; and primarily locally owned processing facilities. Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program. Establishes the Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program and authorizes the Governor to award grants to political subdivisions from the Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund as part of the Program. Such grants, in amounts up to $25,000, shall be awarded on a competitive basis to support infrastructure development projects that support local food production and sustainable farming. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to develop guidelines for the Program that favor projects that establish or maintain farmers markets; businesses or organizations that manage the aggregation, distribution, and marketing of food products primarily from local and regional producers; and primarily locally owned processing facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Food and Farming Infrastructure Grant Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 185 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2068ER)
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled
2021-02-19SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21200188D-S1
2021-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-19SenateRead third time
2021-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200188D-S1
2021-02-16SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102653D

Same As/Similar To

HB2068 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32303(n/a)See Bill Text
32304(n/a)See Bill Text
32310(n/a)See Bill Text
32311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2068
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2068+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2068S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2068ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0185+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200188D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2068F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2068FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2068FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0101C0001+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0041+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0201C0002+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0021+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1216+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0072+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01V0010+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0174HB2068+HB2068
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0206HB2068+HB2068

Bill Comments

feedback