VA HB2067 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Decertification of law-enforcement officers; notification. Requires persons obligated to notify the Criminal Justice Services Board when a law-enforcement officer or jail officer has committed an act or been convicted of a crime that requires decertification to notify the Criminal Justice Services Board within 48 hours of becoming aware of such act or conviction. The bill requires that, upon such notification, decertification be immediate. Any conviction of a misdemeanor that has been appealed to a court of record shall not be considered a conviction unless a final order of conviction is entered.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; decertification, notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0496) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 496 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2067ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (17-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101613D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police
Counties Cities and Towns
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police