VA HB2066 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history record information; National Crime Prevention and Privacy Compact of 1998. Authorizes Virginia to become a signatory to the National Crime Prevention and Privacy Compact of 1998. The Compact allows member states to exchange criminal history records for noncriminal justice purposes according to the laws of the requesting state.
Title
National Crime Prevention and Privacy Compact of 1998; criminal history record information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 319 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2066ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 11-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101607D |