VA HB2065 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2065

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Produce Rx Program established; report. Directs the Department of Social Services, in cooperation with the Department of Medical Assistance Services, to convene a work group to develop a plan for a three-year pilot Produce Rx Program to incentivize consumption of qualifying fruits and vegetables by eligible individuals for whom increased consumption of fruits and vegetables is recommended by a qualified care provider. The bill requires the Department of Social Services to report on the activities of the work group and the elements of the plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by October 1, 2021. Produce Rx Program established; report. Directs the Department of Social Services, in cooperation with the Department of Medical Assistance Services, to convene a work group to develop a plan for a three-year pilot Produce Rx Program to incentivize consumption of qualifying fruits and vegetables by eligible individuals for whom increased consumption of fruits and vegetables is recommended by a qualified care provider. The bill requires the Department of Social Services to report on the activities of the work group and the elements of the plan to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Produce Rx Program; Dept. of Social Services, et al., to develop a plan for a 3-yr. pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201
2021-02-27SenateSigned by President
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2065ER)
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2021-02-23SenateRead third time
2021-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2065H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103840D-H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee on Health, Welfare and Institutions amendment rejected
2021-02-03HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103840D-H1
2021-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102721D

Same As/Similar To

HB2065 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632806(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2065
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2065+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2065H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2065ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0212+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2065AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2065AHR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2065F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2065FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2065FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1204C0003+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0067+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0205C0016+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0092+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1437+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0039+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0029+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0299HB2065+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0380HB2065+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0382HB2065+HB2065
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0383HB2065+HB2065

Bill Comments

feedback