VA HB2065 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DNA samples taken at arrest and upon conviction. Expands the scope of DNA (deoxyribonucleic acid) collection to provide that every person convicted of a violation of (i) §18.2-67.4 (sexual battery), (ii) §18.2-67.4:2 (sexual abuse of a child 13 years of age or older but under 15), (iii) subsection C of §18.2-67.5 (attempt to commit sexual battery), (iv) §18.2-130 (peeping), or (v) §18.2-370.6 (penetrating the mouth of a child under 13 with the tongue) shall have a sample of his blood, saliva, or tissue taken for DNA analysis. The bill also provides that the Department of Forensic Science may include the identification characteristics of an individual's DNA profile in the DNA data bank when ordered by a circuit court pursuant to a lawful plea agreement.
Title
D N A samples; taken of those convicted of sexual battery when victim is a minor.
Sponsors
Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. William Cleaveland [R] | Del. John Cox [R] |
Del. Gregory Habeeb [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. Jackson Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2065ER) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105294D-S1 (93-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2065S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105294D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105294D-S1 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2065H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104765D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104765D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101119D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 310.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 310.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |