VA HB2063 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2063

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Overtime Wage Act; penalties. Requires an employer to compensate certain employees at a rate not less than one and one-half times the employee's regular rate of pay, defined in the bill, for any hours worked in excess of 40 hours in any one workweek. The bill includes provisions for calculating overtime premiums due to fire protection and law-enforcement employees by certain public sector employers. The penalties provided by the bill for an employer's failure to pay such overtime wages, including civil and criminal penalties, are the same as currently provided for failing to pay wages generally. The statute of limitations for bringing a claim for a violation of the bill is three years. Virginia Overtime Wage Act; penalties. Requires an employer to compensate certain employees at a rate not less than one and one-half times the employee's regular rate of pay, defined in the bill, for any hours worked in excess of 40 hours in any one workweek. The bill includes provisions for calculating overtime premiums due to fire protection and law-enforcement employees by certain public sector employers. The penalties provided by the bill for an employer's failure to pay such overtime wages, including civil and criminal penalties, are the same as currently provided for failing to pay wages generally. The statute of limitations for bringing a claim for a violation of the bill is three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Overtime Wage Act; overtime compensation for employees, definitions, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 445 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2063ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-25HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amendments (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-25SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-25SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-25SenateRead third time
2021-02-25SenateFloor substitute printed 21200667D-S1 (Saslaw)
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
2021-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N)
2021-02-22SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-22SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2063H1
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103929D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103929D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102616D

Same As/Similar To

HB2063 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40129(n/a)See Bill Text
40129.1(n/a)See Bill Text
40129.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2063
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2063+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2063H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2063S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2063ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0445+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200184A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2063AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2063ASE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2063F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2063FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2063FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1401C0028+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14C0091+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1337+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0053+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02V0042+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0101+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0397HB2063+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1976+HB2063
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0460HB2063+HB2063

Bill Comments 750

feedback