VA HB2061 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2061
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Immunization Information System; health care entities; required participation. Requires any health care provider in the Commonwealth that administers immunizations to participate in the Virginia Immunization Information System (VIIS) and report patient immunization history and information to VIIS. Under current law, participation in VIIS is optional for authorized health care entities. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.
Title
VIIS; any health care provider in the Commonwealth that administers immunizations to participate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 1/1/22) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2061ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 19-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102411D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2061 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)