VA HB2061 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Adult protective services; statistics regarding reports of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation. Requires the Department of Social Services (the Department) to (i) keep records of the number of reports filed alleging suspected adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation and the disposition of such reports and (ii) annually publish nonidentifying statistics regarding such information. The bill also requires the Department to annually disseminate to the Department of Health and all local boards of social services and area agencies on aging a report of such information, categorized by the planning district in which the report was filed; the facility in which the abused, neglected, or exploited adult resided at the time of the abuse, neglect, or exploitation, if applicable; and the names of individuals who were the subject of criminal charges as a result of the investigation.
Title
Adult protective services; statistics regarding reports of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102286D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2061 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2061+hil |