VA HB2060 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2060
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Online portal for tax practitioners analysis. Directs the Department of Taxation to analyze the prospect of establishing an online portal allowing access to taxpayer information for tax practitioners who possess a valid Power of Attorney and Declaration of Representative form for each client for whom such tax practitioner seeks to access such taxpayer information. The Department shall examine similar systems from the Internal Revenue Service or other states and also analyze cybersecurity concerns in such systems. The bill requires a report to the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2021. Online portal for tax practitioners analysis. Directs the Department of Taxation to analyze the prospect of establishing an online portal allowing access to taxpayer information for tax practitioners who possess a valid Power of Attorney and Declaration of Representative form for each client for whom such tax practitioner seeks to access such taxpayer information. The Department shall examine similar systems from the Internal Revenue Service or other states and also analyze cybersecurity concerns in such systems. The bill requires a report to the General Assembly no later than December 1, 2021.
Title
Online portal for tax practitioners; Department of Taxation shall analyze prospect of establishing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2060ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2060H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103294D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103294D-H1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100872D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2060 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)