VA HB2059 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Nonpayment of child support; amount of arrearage paid; time period to pay arrearage; repayment schedule; suspension of driver's license. Provides that an individual who is delinquent in child support payments or has failed to comply with a subpoena, summons, or warrant relating to paternity or child support proceedings is entitled to a judicial hearing if he makes a written request within 30 days from service of a notice of intent to suspend or renew his driver's license. Current law provides such an entitlement if such request is made within 10 days from such notice. The bill further allows the Department of Motor Vehicles to renew a driver's license or terminate a license suspension imposed on an individual if such individual has reached an agreement with the Department of Social Services to satisfy the child support payment delinquency within a 10-year period and has made at least one payment of at least five percent of the total delinquency or $600, whichever is less, as opposed to whichever is greater under current law, under such agreement. The bill further provides that, where such a repayment agreement has been entered into and such an individual has failed to comply with such agreement, the Department of Motor Vehicles shall suspend or refuse to renew such individual's driver's license until it has received certification from the Department of Social Services that such individual has entered into a subsequent agreement to pay within a period of seven years and has paid the lesser amount, as opposed to greater amount under current law, of at least one payment of $1,200 or seven percent, as opposed to five percent under current law, of the current delinquency. The bill provides that an individual who fails to comply with such a subsequent agreement may enter into a new agreement if such individual has made a payment in the lesser amount, as opposed to the greater amount under current law, of $1,800 or 10 percent, as opposed to five percent under current law, and agrees to a repayment schedule of not more than seven years, which is consistent with the timeframe provided by the current law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child support; nonpayment, amount of arrearage paid, suspension of driver's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) (Y: 3 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenators: McDougle, Dance, Peake
2019-02-19SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-18HouseDelegates: Carr, Bell, R.B., Gilbert
2019-02-18HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-18HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-15SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-15SenateSenate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 94-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (3-Y 94-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-11SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 1-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 19101815D-E
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2059E
2019-01-30HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101815D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462320.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2059
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2059+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2059E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0053+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0074+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2071+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0229+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2059+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0498HB2059+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2793+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0668HB2059+HB2059
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3237+HB2059

Bill Comments

feedback