VA HB2056 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Professions and occupations; proof of identity. Replaces the requirement for proof of citizenship to obtain a license, certificate, registration, or other authorization issued by the Commonwealth to engage in a business, trade, profession, or occupation, except for an application with the Department of Health Professions, with a requirement to provide proof of identity that includes a government-issued identification card or driver's license, or other photo identification, along with documentation of the applicant's current address. Under current law, an application must include either a social security number or a control number issued by the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; proof of identity to obtain a license, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-31 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31HouseStricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103080D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541116(n/a)See Bill Text
6321937(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback