VA HB2056 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
False information and hoax criminal activities; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to knowingly, with the intent to mislead a law-enforcement agency, cause another to give a false report to any law-enforcement official by publicly simulating a violation of Chapter 4 (?§18.2-30 et seq.) (Crimes Against the Person) or Chapter 5 (?§18.2-77 et seq.) (Crimes Against Property) of Title 18.2. This bill is identical to SB 1031.
Title
Law-enforcement officials; to knowingly, with intent to mislead an official, giving false reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 6-N) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 6-N) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2056ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Chase, McDougle, Deeds |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Delegates: Yancey, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring |
2019-02-20 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-20 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19106788D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2056S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106788D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106788D-S1 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2056H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106256D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106256D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101413D |