VA HB2055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; review of employee recruitment, retention, and compensation; report. Requires the Director of the Department of Human Resource Management to perform an annual review of recruitment and retention trends and certain statuses related to classified job roles across state agencies. The bill also provides for the Director to biennially, on or before September 1 of each odd-numbered year, submit a report to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance on (i) the classified job roles that should receive higher salary increases based on identified recruitment and retention challenges, (ii) the appropriate amount by which the salary of such classified job roles should be increased, and (iii) cost estimates for funding any salary increases.
Title
DHRM; review of employee recruitment, retention, and compensation, report.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0424) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 424 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2055ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, Barker, Dunnavant |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Carr, Jones, S.C., Poindexter |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100628D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2055E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100628D |